TX SB1404 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consent to the disclosure of certain information and to other matters relating to newborn and infant screening tests.
Title
Relating to consent to the disclosure of certain information and to other matters relating to newborn and infant screening tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1678 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1678 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3735 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF