TX SB14 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
Pending: House General Investigating & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
Pending: House General Investigating & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ethics of public officers and related requirements; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the ethics of public officers and related requirements; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
State Officers
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
State Officers