TX SB1398 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the placement and use of video cameras in certain self-contained classrooms or other settings providing special education services.
Title
Relating to the placement and use of video cameras in certain self-contained classrooms or other settings providing special education services.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1398 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1398 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
VIDEO CAMERAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
VIDEO CAMERAS