TX SB1386 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of habitual toll violator remedies by certain toll project entities.
Title
Relating to the use of habitual toll violator remedies by certain toll project entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
County Government--Roads
Highways
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration