TX SB1374 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to annual reports by the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission on the operations and conditions of probation services in this state.
Title
Relating to annual reports by the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission on the operations and conditions of probation services in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Juvenile Boards & Officers
JUVENILE PROBATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
YOUTH COMMISSION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Juvenile Boards & Officers
JUVENILE PROBATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
YOUTH COMMISSION