TX SB1368 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the creation of a county ethics commission in certain counties; providing civil and criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the creation of a county ethics commission in certain counties; providing civil and criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-23 | Amended | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2301 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--General
Ethics
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--General
Ethics
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING