TX SB1367 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain information for employees of a county courthouse or the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System and the employees' family members.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain information for employees of a county courthouse or the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System and the employees' family members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2039 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COUNTY COURTHOUSES
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Personnel
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Personnel
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses