TX SB1367 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to policies and training regarding the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education; providing immunity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to policies and training regarding the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education; providing immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1307 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback