TX SB1360 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the information required to be included in or with a school district ad valorem tax bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the information required to be included in or with a school district ad valorem tax bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Finance
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback