TX SB1349 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that a person hold a license issued by the appropriate state agency to be employed as a marriage and family therapist by a school district.
Title
Relating to a requirement that a person hold a license issued by the appropriate state agency to be employed as a marriage and family therapist by a school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-13 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Record vote | |
2011-04-12 | Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-12 | Record vote | |
2011-04-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-12 | Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Education | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed | |
2011-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING & COUNSELORS
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING & COUNSELORS
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations