TX SB1334 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation categories for state funding of public transportation.
Title
Relating to the allocation categories for state funding of public transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous