TX SB1327 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a district engineer for the Texas Department of Transportation to temporarily lower speed limits.
Title
Relating to the authority of a district engineer for the Texas Department of Transportation to temporarily lower speed limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |