TX SB1323 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the amount of a surcharge assessed on conviction of certain intoxicated driver offenses on the driver's license of certain persons who complete a drug court program.
Title
Relating to the amount of a surcharge assessed on conviction of certain intoxicated driver offenses on the driver's license of certain persons who complete a drug court program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1906 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
DRUG COURTS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
DRUG COURTS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID