TX SB132 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to registration with the Selective Service System of certain applicants for a driver's license or personal identification certificate.
Title
Relating to registration with the Selective Service System of certain applicants for a driver's license or personal identification certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-07 | Record vote | |
2011-05-07 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-07 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-07 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-07 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-07 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-07 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-06 | Postponed | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-05 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Military & Veterans
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses