TX SB1318 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of dates of birth under the public information law.
Title
Relating to the availability of dates of birth under the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1655 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Co-sponsor authorized
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1318 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01318I.htm |