TX SB1317 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Summary
Relating to education and examination requirements for the issuance of a driver's license to certain persons.
Title
Relating to education and examination requirements for the issuance of a driver's license to certain persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-30 | Read | |
2009-05-30 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-13 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Motion to table fails | |
2009-05-12 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Motion withdrawn | |
2009-05-05 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1779 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Subjects
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Driver Education & Training
Minors
Minors--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Driver Education & Training
Minors
Minors--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses