TX SB1312 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation and practice of veterinary medicine; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation and practice of veterinary medicine; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - SB 1312Third Reading House (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-04 - House - SB 1312Third Reading House (Y: 82 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-04 - House - SB 1312Third Reading House (Y: 82 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-14 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-08 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-08 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-07 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-07 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-07 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-01 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2013-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Animals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF