TX SB13 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state contracts with and investments in certain companies that boycott energy companies.
Title
Relating to state contracts with and investments in certain companies that boycott energy companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1620 (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#687 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - Amended RV#637 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1620 (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#687 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - Amended RV#637 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1620 |
2021-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-14 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-14 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#687 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#637 |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-03 | House | Amended 1-P. King |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 2189 |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2189 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2189 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2189 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions