TX HB2189 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state contracts with and investments in certain companies that boycott energy companies.
Title
Relating to state contracts with and investments in certain companies that boycott energy companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 13 |
2021-04-26 | House | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-26 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-19 | House | Postponed 4/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB13 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB13 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions