TX SB1287 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the cost of interconnecting certain electric generation facilities with the ERCOT transmission system.
Title
Relating to the cost of interconnecting certain electric generation facilities with the ERCOT transmission system.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Shelby Slawson [R] |
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-22 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric