TX SB1287 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the Homeland Security Council.
Title
Relating to the composition of the Homeland Security Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3885 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOMELAND SECURITY COUNCIL
Legislature
RISK MANAGEMENT, STATE OFFICE OF
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOMELAND SECURITY COUNCIL
Legislature
RISK MANAGEMENT, STATE OFFICE OF
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions