TX SB1281 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to assessments for water and energy improvements in certain municipalities and counties.
Title
Relating to assessments for water and energy improvements in certain municipalities and counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
WATER
Water--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
WATER
Water--General