TX SB1270 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of certain events to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of certain events to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3213 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback