TX SB1267 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to school district ad valorem tax rates.
Title
Relating to school district ad valorem tax rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District