TX SB1266 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities for the building products, materials, or methods used in the construction of residential or commercial structures.
Title
Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities for the building products, materials, or methods used in the construction of residential or commercial structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2439 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--General
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
City Government
City Government--General
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1266 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01266I.htm |