TX HB2439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities for the building products, materials, or methods used in the construction or renovation of residential or commercial buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities for the building products, materials, or methods used in the construction or renovation of residential or commercial buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1742 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#792 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amended RV#774 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1742
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateAmended
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#792
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#774
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29HouseAmended 2-Nevárez
2019-04-29HouseAmended 1-Phelan
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1266 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2439
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02439I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02439H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02439E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02439S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02439F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2439&RcdVtNo=774&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2439&RcdVtNo=792&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=48
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2439&RcdVtNo=1742&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback