TX SB1260 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Railroad Commission of Texas to contract for the treatment of and sell drill cuttings.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Railroad Commission of Texas to contract for the treatment of and sell drill cuttings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#688 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-05 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#688 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3381 |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3381 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION