TX HB3381 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Railroad Commission of Texas to contract for the treatment of and sell drill cuttings.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Railroad Commission of Texas to contract for the treatment of and sell drill cuttings.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1260 |
2021-04-27 | House | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION