TX SB1233 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study of the disaster preparedness for certain state military installations.
Title
Relating to a study of the disaster preparedness for certain state military installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Seliger |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3277 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee