TX SB1226 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the term of office for a director of the Northeast Texas Municipal Water District.
Title
Relating to the term of office for a director of the Northeast Texas Municipal Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-13 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-01 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2914 |
2023-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2914 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2914 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2914 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
AVINGER, CITY OF
DAINGERFIELD, CITY OF
HUGHES SPRINGS, CITY OF
JEFFERSON, CITY OF
LONE STAR, CITY OF
NORTHEAST TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
ORE CITY, CITY OF
PITTSBURG, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
DAINGERFIELD, CITY OF
HUGHES SPRINGS, CITY OF
JEFFERSON, CITY OF
LONE STAR, CITY OF
NORTHEAST TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
ORE CITY, CITY OF
PITTSBURG, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility