TX SB1223 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to suits against The University of Texas at Tyler.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to suits against The University of Texas at Tyler.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-05-24HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenatePassed
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-19SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-03-02SenateFiled
2017-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback