TX SB122 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to postconviction forensic DNA analysis.
Title
Relating to postconviction forensic DNA analysis.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Will Hartnett [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-13 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
DNA
FORENSIC TESTING
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
DNA
FORENSIC TESTING