TX SB1200 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Summary
Relating to disclosure of contracts between a member of the legislature, or a business entity in which the member has a substantial interest, and a state agency.
Title
Relating to disclosure of contracts between a member of the legislature, or a business entity in which the member has a substantial interest, and a state agency.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Ogden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed | |
2009-02-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |