TX SB1193 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the liability of and issuance of titles and permits for motor vehicles purchased from motor vehicle dealers that go out of business.
Title
Relating to the liability of and issuance of titles and permits for motor vehicles purchased from motor vehicle dealers that go out of business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration