TX SB1181 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Referred to Business & Industry
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Referred to Business & Industry
Summary
Relating to the employment of certain persons by amusement parks.
Title
Relating to the employment of certain persons by amusement parks.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Amended | |
2009-04-22 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
AMUSEMENT PARKS & CARNIVAL RIDES
Amusements, Games, Sports
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
AMUSEMENT PARKS & CARNIVAL RIDES
Amusements, Games, Sports
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
SEXUAL OFFENDERS