TX SB1162 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to notice to the attorney general of an action, suit, or proceeding challenging the validity of a Texas statute or rule.
Title
Relating to notice to the attorney general of an action, suit, or proceeding challenging the validity of a Texas statute or rule.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4293 (Same As) 2009-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs