TX SB1136 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to implementation of certain health care provider initiatives and measures designed to reduce costs and improve recipient health outcomes under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to implementation of certain health care provider initiatives and measures designed to reduce costs and improve recipient health outcomes under Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1299 |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID