TX SB1128 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the conduct and administration of elections.
Title
Relating to the conduct and administration of elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1128 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01128I.htm |