TX SB1125 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing for testimony of a forensic analyst in a criminal proceeding.
Title
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing for testimony of a forensic analyst in a criminal proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3845 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WITNESSES
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WITNESSES