TX SB1123 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conditions on the receipt of tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for adopted students formerly in foster or other residential care.
Title
Relating to conditions on the receipt of tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for adopted students formerly in foster or other residential care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1123 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1123 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |