TX SB1119 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the recovery of medical or health care expenses in civil actions.
Title
Relating to the recovery of medical or health care expenses in civil actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1956 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Left pending in committee