TX SB1118 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of video lottery games by licensed horse and greyhound racetrack operators, to a defense for the operation of video lottery by Indian tribes, to the authority of the Texas Lottery Commission and the Texas Racing Commission, and to the conduct of gambling in this state; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the operation of video lottery games by licensed horse and greyhound racetrack operators, to a defense for the operation of video lottery by Indian tribes, to the authority of the Texas Lottery Commission and the Texas Racing Commission, and to the conduct of gambling in this state; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-08 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR33 (Enabling for) 2011-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
GAMBLING
GREYHOUND RACING
HORSE RACING
LOTTERIES
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
VIDEO LOTTERY
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
GAMBLING
GREYHOUND RACING
HORSE RACING
LOTTERIES
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
VIDEO LOTTERY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1118 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01118I.htm |