TX SB1117 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of a parent contributing to the nonattendance of a public school student.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of a parent contributing to the nonattendance of a public school student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-04 | Read first time | |
2011-05-03 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice