TX SB1098 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Meeting cancelled
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain contracts regarding airports and associated air navigation facilities operated by or on behalf of a local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain contracts regarding airports and associated air navigation facilities operated by or on behalf of a local government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-04-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-05SenateFiled
2021-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1739 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback