TX HB1739 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain contracts regarding airports operated by or on behalf of a local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain contracts regarding airports operated by or on behalf of a local government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#668 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#668
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03HouseAmended 1-Cyrier
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1098 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Meeting cancelled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1739
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01739I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01739H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01739E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01739S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01739H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01739I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01739H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01739H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01739E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01739E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01739S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01739S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1739&RcdVtNo=668&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback