TX SB1096 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to guardianships; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1371 (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
GUARDIANS & WARDS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
GUARDIANS & WARDS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SUPREME COURT