TX SB1087 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the hours of instruction for cosmetology licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the hours of instruction for cosmetology licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-02-24SenateFiled
2017-02-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback