TX SB1080 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation to determine applicant eligibility for a license and to discipline license holders.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation to determine applicant eligibility for a license and to discipline license holders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions