TX SB1068 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal of restrictions on funding and payment of costs for certain full-time online educational programs; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the removal of restrictions on funding and payment of costs for certain full-time online educational programs; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB710 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Public Education
HB710 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Public Education
HB710 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
INTERNET
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
INTERNET