TX SB1058 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting of criminal history record information of educators and other public school employees who engage in certain misconduct.
Title
Relating to the reporting of criminal history record information of educators and other public school employees who engage in certain misconduct.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety